Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR918 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R12809 MMS-D
 By: Gattis H.R. No. 918


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The dedicated service and immeasurable sacrifice of
 our nation's military personnel are being recognized on May 16,
 2009, as Americans observe this country's 59th annual Armed Forces
 Day; and
 WHEREAS, Before 1950, separate days had been set aside to
 honor the branches of the armed forces individually; the
 establishment of a single observance followed the combining in 1947
 of the Departments of War and Navy into one entity, the National
 Military Establishment, which two years later became known as the
 Department of Defense; and
 WHEREAS, Members of the army, navy, marines, air force, and
 coast guard are justly proud of the heroic records forged by those
 branches and by their continuing contributions to the security of
 American citizens at home and abroad; and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Army was established on June 14, 1775, when
 the Second Continental Congress authorized the formation of 10
 companies of riflemen; from the American Revolution to the present
 operations in Afghanistan and Iraq, the army has furnished the
 majority of American ground troops when the country has taken up
 arms; today this service is composed of a number of basic branches,
 including Infantry, Military Intelligence, Aviation, the Corps of
 Engineers, and Special Forces, and such special branches as the
 Army Medical Department, Chaplains, and Judge Advocate General's
 Corps; and
 WHEREAS, On October 13, 1775, the Second Continental Congress
 called for the fitting out of two warships, thereby founding the
 Continental Navy; although disbanded following the conclusion of
 the Revolutionary War, this service was reestablished with the
 creation of the Department of the Navy on April 30, 1798, and today,
 naval personnel ensure the defense of the nation by sea and give
 seaborne support to the other military forces; and
 WHEREAS, A month after the Continental Congress authorized
 the procurement and dispatching of the navy's first ships, it
 passed a resolution, on November 10, 1775, calling for the raising
 of two marine battalions; the Marine Corps disbanded, like the
 navy, following the War of Independence, but it was reestablished
 on July 11, 1798; a separate service within the Department of the
 Navy, the Marine Corps prepares for counterinsurgency, guerilla,
 and amphibious warfare and commando operations; and
 WHEREAS, The U.S. Air Force, which became a separate branch
 within the Department of Defense on September 18, 1947, had its
 genesis in the 1907 creation of an aeronautical division within the
 U.S. Army Signal Corps; military aviation subsequently achieved
 widespread recognition during World War I, when planes proved their
 effectiveness in reconnaissance and bombing missions, and air power
 became a crucial factor in World War II, during which time the U.S.
 Army Air Forces emerged as the most powerful air force in the world;
 today's air force defends the country in the realms of air, space,
 and cyberspace; and
 WHEREAS, Now part of the Department of Homeland Security, the
 U.S. Coast Guard has assumed many duties throughout its history,
 from protecting against pirates to intercepting contraband,
 conducting search and rescue operations, responding to oil spills,
 and licensing and certifying all U.S. maritime personnel; its
 wide-ranging wartime service has included escort and patrol duty
 and assisting amphibious landings; and
 WHEREAS, Together with members of the reserve forces, the
 Army National Guard, and the Air National Guard, America's active
 duty servicemen and servicewomen are committed to maintaining the
 nation's security and are prepared to do their utmost in defense of
 their country and the cause of freedom; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 81st Texas
 Legislature hereby recognize May 16, 2009, as Armed Forces Day and
 extend to all the members of the nation's military profound
 appreciation for their steadfast and courageous efforts in our
 country's behalf.