Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1047 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1047
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on International
 Relations and Trade; March 25, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procurement methods authorized for public projects
 by a combined municipally owned electric, water, and wastewater
 utility situated in an economically distressed area within 30 miles
 of the Lower Texas Gulf Coast.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 271.182, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This subchapter applies to a municipally owned combined
 electric, water, and wastewater utility situated in an economically
 distressed area and located within 30 miles of the Lower Texas Gulf
 Coast.  For this subchapter, "combined" means that the utilities
 are managed and controlled by one board whose members are appointed
 by the governing body of the municipality and that the financing of
 capital improvements is secured from the revenues of all three
 utilities.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *