Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1059 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar, Zaffirini S.B. No. 1059
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; April 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 2, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1059 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for the removal of a cattle guard on a
 county road.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 251, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 251.0096 to read as follows:
 Sec. 251.0096.  REMOVAL OF CATTLE GUARDS FROM COUNTY ROADS.
 (a)  The commissioners court of a county may remove a cattle guard
 from a county road of any class if the commissioners court notifies
 each person who owns land adjacent to the cattle guard by certified
 mail not less than 90 days before the proposed removal of the cattle
 guard.
 (b)  The commissioners court is not required to hold a public
 hearing on a proposed cattle guard removal.  If a resident of the
 county requests a public hearing, the commissioners court shall
 hold a public hearing on the removal of the cattle guard. To be
 valid, a request for a public hearing must be in writing and be made
 before the 75th day after the date the notice required by Subsection
 (a) is mailed.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *