Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1061 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R8853 KCR-D
 By: Shapiro S.B. No. 1061


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to improving the accuracy of reporting concerning certain
 criminal history.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 60, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 60.10 to read as follows:
 Art. 60.10.  DATA REPORTING IMPROVEMENT PLAN. (a) In this
 article, "disposition completeness percentage" has the meaning
 assigned by Article 60.21(c).
 (b)  This article applies only to a county that has an
 average disposition completeness percentage, including both
 juvenile and adult dispositions, of less than 90 percent, as
 reflected in the first report the Department of Public Safety
 submits under Article 60.21(b)(2) on or after January 1, 2009.
 (c)  The commissioners court of a county described by
 Subsection (b) shall establish a local data advisory board as
 described by Article 60.09 not later than November 1, 2009. A local
 data advisory board established under this article may include any
 person described by Article 60.09(b) and must include:
 (1)  the sheriff of the county, or the sheriff's
 designee;
 (2)  an attorney who represents the state in the
 district courts of the county;
 (3)  an attorney who represents the state in the county
 courts of the county;
 (4)  the clerk for the district courts of the county, or
 the clerk's designee;
 (5)  the clerk for the county courts of the county, or
 the clerk's designee;
 (6)  the police chief of the municipality with the
 greatest population located in the county, or the chief's designee;
 (7)  a representative of the county's automated data
 processing services, if the county performs those services; and
 (8)  a representative of an entity with whom the county
 contracts for automated data processing services, if the county
 contracts for those services.
 (d)  In addition to the duties described by Article 60.09(a),
 a local data advisory board established under this article must
 prepare a data reporting improvement plan. The data reporting
 improvement plan must:
 (1)  describe the manner in which the county intends to
 improve the county's disposition completeness percentage;
 (2)  ensure that the county takes the steps necessary
 for the county's average disposition completeness percentage to be
 equal to or greater than 90 percent in the first report the
 Department of Public Safety submits under Article 60.21(b)(2) on or
 after January 1, 2013; and
 (3)  include a comprehensive strategy by which the
 county will permanently maintain the county's disposition
 completeness percentage at or above 90 percent.
 (e)  Not later than June 1, 2010, a local data advisory board
 established under this article shall submit to the Department of
 Public Safety the data reporting improvement plan prepared for the
 county. On receipt of a data reporting improvement plan under this
 article, the department shall post the plan on the Internet website
 maintained by the department.
 (f)  The public safety director of the Department of Public
 Safety may adopt rules concerning the contents and form of a data
 reporting improvement plan prepared under this article.
 (g) This article expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. Article 60.21, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (b) The Department of Public Safety shall:
 (1) monitor the submission of arrest and disposition
 information by local jurisdictions;
 (2) annually submit to the Legislative Budget Board,
 the governor, the state auditor, and the standing committees in the
 senate and house of representatives that have primary jurisdiction
 over criminal justice and the Department of Public Safety [council]
 a report regarding the level of reporting by local jurisdictions;
 (3) identify local jurisdictions that do not report
 arrest or disposition information or that partially report
 information; and
 (4) for use in determining the status of outstanding
 dispositions, publish monthly on the Department of Public Safety's
 Internet website or on another electronic publication a report
 listing each arrest by local jurisdiction for which there is no
 corresponding final court disposition.
 (c)  The report described by Subsection (b)(2) must contain a
 disposition completeness percentage for each county in this state.
 For purposes of this subsection, "disposition completeness
 percentage" means the percentage of arrest charges a county reports
 to the Department of Public Safety to be entered in the computerized
 criminal history system under this chapter that were brought
 against a person in the county for which a disposition has been
 subsequently reported and entered into the computerized criminal
 history system.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.