Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1122 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1122
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 30, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1122 By: Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement to keep records of game bird or animal
 carcasses placed in a cold storage or processing facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (8), Section 42.001, Parks and
 Wildlife Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (8) "Quartering" means the processing of an animal
 into not more than two hindquarters each having the leg bone (femur)
 attached down to the knee [hock] and two front shoulders
 [forequarters] each having the leg bones (scapula and humerus)
 [portion to the knee] attached down to the elbow [shoulder blade].
 The term also includes removal of two back straps [and trimmings
 from the neck and rib cage].
 SECTION 2. Subsections (a) and (f), Section 62.029, Parks
 and Wildlife Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) In [As used in] this section:
 (1)  "Carcass" has the meaning assigned by Section
 42.001.
 (2) "Cold[, "cold] storage or processing facility" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 42.001.
 (3)  "Hunting lease" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 43.041.
 (4)  "Quartering" has the meaning assigned by Section
 42.001.
 (f) This section does not apply to a private, noncommercial,
 family-owned cold storage or processing facility unless the
 facility is located on a hunting lease.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *