Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1122 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1122


 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement to keep records of game bird or animal
 carcasses placed in a cold storage or processing facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (8), Section 42.001, Parks and
 Wildlife Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (8) "Quartering" means the processing of an animal
 into not more than two hindquarters each having the leg bone (femur)
 attached down to the knee [hock] and two front shoulders
 [forequarters] each having the leg bones (scapula and humerus)
 [portion to the knee] attached down to the elbow [shoulder blade].
 The term also includes removal of two back straps [and trimmings
 from the neck and rib cage].
 SECTION 2. Section 62.029, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (f) and adding Subsection
 (g) to read as follows:
 (a) In [As used in] this section:
 (1)  "Carcass" has the meaning assigned by Section
 42.001.
 (2) "Cold[, "cold] storage or processing facility" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 42.001.
 (3)  "Hunting lease" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 43.041.
 (4)  "Private cold storage or processing facility"
 means a cold storage or processing facility that is not available
 for use by the public.
 (5)  "Quartering" has the meaning assigned by Section
 42.001.
 (f) This section does not apply to a private, noncommercial,
 family-owned cold storage or processing facility unless the
 facility is located on a hunting lease and is made available to
 individuals other than the landowner, the landowner's nonpaying
 family members, or the landowner's nonpaying guests.
 (g)  This section does not require the entry or maintenance
 of a record for the carcass of a deer or antelope that is properly
 tagged and is placed in a private cold storage or processing
 facility.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1122 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 18, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1122 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 9, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor