By: Nichols S.B. No. 1129 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2009; March 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to membership on and reporting requirements of the child fatality review team committee. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 264.502, Family Code, are amended to read as follows: (b) The members of the committee who serve under Subsections (a)(1) through (3) shall select the following additional committee members: (1) a criminal prosecutor involved in prosecuting crimes against children; (2) a sheriff; (3) a justice of the peace; (4) a medical examiner; (5) a police chief; (6) a pediatrician experienced in diagnosing and treating child abuse and neglect; (7) a child educator; (8) a child mental health provider; (9) a public health professional; (10) a child protective services specialist; (11) a sudden infant death syndrome family service provider; (12) a neonatologist; (13) a child advocate; (14) a chief juvenile probation officer; (15) a child abuse prevention specialist; (16) a representative of the Department of Public Safety; [and] (17) a representative of the Texas Department of Transportation; (18) a representative of emergency medical service providers; and (19) a provider of services to victims of family violence. (c) Members of the committee selected under Subsection (b) serve three-year terms with the terms of [five or] six or seven members, as appropriate, expiring February 1 each year. SECTION 2. Subsection (f), Section 264.503, Family Code, is amended to read as follows: (f) Not later than April 1 of each year, the [The] committee shall issue a report containing aggregate data collected by review teams regarding [for] each preventable child death[. The report must include findings related to the child's death], recommendations on how to prevent similar deaths, and details surrounding the department's involvement with the child prior to the child's death. The [Not later than April 1 of each year, the] committee shall [publish a compilation of the reports published under this subsection during the year,] submit a copy of the report [compilation] to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and department, and make the report [compilation] available to the public. Not later than October 1 of each year, the department shall submit a written response on the report [compilation] from the previous year to the committee, governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives describing which of the committee's recommendations regarding the operation of the child protective services system the department will implement and the methods of implementation. SECTION 3. The members of the child fatality review team committee under Subsection (a), Section 264.502, Family Code, responsible for selecting the additional members of the committee required by Subsection (b), Section 264.502, Family Code, as amended by this Act, shall make those appointments not later than November 1, 2009. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *