Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1145 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1145


 AN ACT
 relating to protocol for folding the state flag.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Rod Welsh Act, in
 honor of Rod Welsh, Sergeant-at-Arms of the Texas House of
 Representatives, who is primarily responsible for developing the
 method of folding the state flag of Texas established by this Act.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 3100, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 3100.073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 3100.073.  FOLDED STATE FLAG. (a)  The state flag
 should be folded as follows:
 (1)  fold the flag in half lengthwise with the red
 stripe facing upward;
 (2)  fold the flag in half lengthwise once more,
 concealing the red stripe on the inside of the fold;
 (3)  position the flag with the white star facing
 downward and the blue stripe facing upward;
 (4)  fold the corner with the white stripe to the
 opposite side of the flag to form a triangle;
 (5)  continue folding the corners over in triangles
 until the resulting fold produces a blue triangle with a portion of
 the white star visible; and
 (6) secure all edges into the folds.
 (b)  A folded state flag should be presented or displayed
 with all folded edges secured and with the blue stripe and a portion
 of the white star visible.
 (c)  A folded state flag should be stored or displayed in a
 manner that prevents tearing or soiling of the flag.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1145 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1145 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor