Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1152 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1152
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 7, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the making or acceptance of political contributions in
 a courthouse; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 253.039, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (h) to
 read as follows:
 (a) A person may not knowingly make or authorize a political
 contribution while in the Capitol or a courthouse to:
 (1) a candidate or officeholder;
 (2) a political committee; or
 (3) a person acting on behalf of a candidate,
 officeholder, or political committee.
 (b) A candidate, officeholder, or political committee or a
 person acting on behalf of a candidate, officeholder, or political
 committee may not knowingly accept a political contribution, and
 shall refuse a political contribution that is received, in the
 Capitol or a courthouse.
 (c) This section does not prohibit contributions made in the
 Capitol or a courthouse through the United States postal service or
 a common or contract carrier.
 (h)  In this section, "courthouse" means any building owned
 or occupied by the state, a county, or a municipality, including a
 building or office leased to the state, a county, or a municipality,
 in which a justice or judge sits to conduct court proceedings.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *