Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1153 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1153
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 21, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1153 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of a landowner for an act or omission of a
 firefighter or peace officer on the property of the landowner.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 75, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Section 75.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 75.006.  LIABILITY LIMITED FOR ACTIONS OF FIREFIGHTER
 OR PEACE OFFICER. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Firefighter" means a member of a fire department
 who performs a function listed in Section 419.021(3)(C), Government
 Code.
 (2)  "Livestock" has the meaning assigned by Section
 1.003, Agriculture Code.
 (3)  "Peace officer" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 1.07, Penal Code, or other state or federal law.
 (b)  A landowner is not liable for damages arising from an
 incident or accident caused by livestock of the landowner due to an
 act or omission of a firefighter or a peace officer who has entered
 the landowner's property with or without the permission of the
 landowner, regardless of whether the damage occurs on the
 landowner's property.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an act or omission of a firefighter or peace officer that occurs
 on or after the effective date of this Act. An act or omission of a
 firefighter or peace officer that occurred before the effective
 date of this Act is covered by the law in effect when the act or
 omission occurred, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *