Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1181 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 1181
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1181 By: Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the employment of certain persons by amusement parks.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 2151, Occupations Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2151. REGULATION OF AMUSEMENT RIDES AND AMUSEMENT PARKS
 SECTION 2. Section 2151.002, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (7) to read as follows:
 (7)  "Amusement park" means a temporary or permanent indoor
 or outdoor facility or park where amusement rides are available for
 use by the public.  The term does not include any public or private
 driveway, street, sidewalk or walkway, parking lot, parking garage,
 or other parking area.
 SECTION 3. Chapter 2151, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E.  AMUSEMENT PARK REGULATION
 Sec. 2151.201.  PROHIBITED EMPLOYMENT OF PERSONS CONVICTED
 OF CERTAIN SEXUAL OFFENSES.  An owner or operator of an amusement
 park may not employ in an amusement park a person who has been
 convicted of, entered a plea of nolo contendere or guilty to, or
 received deferred adjudication for an offense involving
 prostitution or another sexual offense.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *