Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1191 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 1191  By: Ellis  Business & Commerce  3/20/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, the Utilities Code requires electric utilities to satisfy 20 percent of their demand growth through energy efficiency incentive programs and provide customers the choice of accessing energy efficiency alternatives. The statute also encourages utilities to facilitate the use of demand response and efficiency programs by retail electric providers and requires that electric utilities both inside and outside the ERCOT region provide customers with energy efficiency materials.   As proposed,  S.B. 1191 places certain requirements upon electric utilities with regard to implementing load management and demand response programs in addition to preexisting demand reduction programs. The bill sets forth the demand reduction requirements as follows: one percent by 2010, two percent by 2012, three percent by 2014, four percent by 2016, and five percent by 2018.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 39.905(a), Utilities Code, to provide that it is the goal of the legislature that each electric utility is required to implement certain requirements, including load management and demand response programs sufficient to achieve, in addition to any reduction resulting from a program in existence on January 1, 2009, reductions in that utility's peak demand in amounts equivalent to at least one percent by December 31, 2010; two percent by December 31, 2012; three percent by December 31, 2014; four percent by December 31, 2016; and five percent by December 31, 2018. Makes nonsubstantive changes.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.     

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1191

 By: Ellis

 Business & Commerce

 3/20/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, the Utilities Code requires electric utilities to satisfy 20 percent of their demand growth through energy efficiency incentive programs and provide customers the choice of accessing energy efficiency alternatives. The statute also encourages utilities to facilitate the use of demand response and efficiency programs by retail electric providers and requires that electric utilities both inside and outside the ERCOT region provide customers with energy efficiency materials.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 1191 places certain requirements upon electric utilities with regard to implementing load management and demand response programs in addition to preexisting demand reduction programs. The bill sets forth the demand reduction requirements as follows: one percent by 2010, two percent by 2012, three percent by 2014, four percent by 2016, and five percent by 2018.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 39.905(a), Utilities Code, to provide that it is the goal of the legislature that each electric utility is required to implement certain requirements, including load management and demand response programs sufficient to achieve, in addition to any reduction resulting from a program in existence on January 1, 2009, reductions in that utility's peak demand in amounts equivalent to at least one percent by December 31, 2010; two percent by December 31, 2012; three percent by December 31, 2014; four percent by December 31, 2016; and five percent by December 31, 2018. Makes nonsubstantive changes.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.