Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1193 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1193
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2009; March 13, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1193 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maintenance and service of certain medical devices
 in health care facilities; providing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 431, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 431.0215 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.0215.  ADDITIONAL PROHIBITED ACTS; CRIMINAL
 PENALTY.  (a)  In this section, "facility" means a hospital,
 ambulatory surgical center, physician's office, or medical clinic
 that is authorized under the laws of this state to provide health
 care in this state.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a person may not
 calibrate, repair, or perform preventive maintenance on or
 otherwise service a device designated by the United States Food and
 Drug Administration as a class II or class III medical device in a
 facility unless the person:
 (1)  holds at least an associate of applied science
 degree issued by an accredited college or university in engineering
 or as a biomedical equipment technician or medical imaging
 specialist, or holds a similar degree focused on the service,
 maintenance, or service and maintenance of medical devices;
 (2)  holds satisfactory evidence of completion of a
 program of service, maintenance, or service and maintenance of
 medical devices issued by the United States military;
 (3)  holds at least an associate degree in an
 electronics field or an information management field and has been
 actively engaged in the service, maintenance, or service and
 maintenance of medical devices for at least two of the preceding
 four years under the direct supervision of an individual who meets
 the requirements of Subdivision (1) or (2); or
 (4)  holds satisfactory evidence of successful
 completion of service, maintenance, or service and maintenance
 training from a medical device manufacturer, provided the person
 only provides service or maintenance for devices made by that
 manufacturer unless the person otherwise meets the requirements of
 Subdivision (1), (2), or (3).
 (c) Subsection (b) does not apply to:
 (1)  the calibration, repair, maintenance, or service
 of a class II or class III medical device that is used only for
 teaching and research purposes;
 (2)  in-service or software upgrades of a medical
 device performed by an employee or authorized sales representative
 of a medical device manufacturer; or
 (3)  routine evaluations specified by the medical
 device manufacturer performed by the owner or person designated by
 the owner of the medical device.
 (d)  A person commits an offense if the person violates
 Subsection (b). An offense under this subsection is a Class C
 misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *