Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1199 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 1199
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; March 31, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 14, Nays 0;
 March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to refunds of and credits for certain sales and use taxes
 paid by certain exempt organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 151.310, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  For purposes of obtaining a refund of or claiming a
 credit for taxes paid under this chapter on the basis of an
 exemption under this section, an organization is not considered
 exempted from the taxes imposed by this chapter before the earlier
 of:
 (1)  the date the organization applied for the
 exemption with the comptroller; or
 (2)  the date of assessment of the organization's tax
 liability by the comptroller as a result of an audit, as applicable.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a refund of or credit for taxes that are paid on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A refund of or credit for taxes that are
 paid before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the taxes were paid, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *