Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1199 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1199


 AN ACT
 relating to refunds of and credits for certain sales and use taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 151.310, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  For purposes of obtaining a refund of or claiming a
 credit for taxes paid under this chapter on the basis of an
 exemption under this section, an organization is not considered
 exempted from the taxes imposed by this chapter before the earlier
 of:
 (1)  the date the organization applied for the
 exemption with the comptroller; or
 (2)  the date of assessment of the organization's tax
 liability by the comptroller as a result of an audit, as applicable.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter I, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.4261 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.4261.  CREDIT OR REIMBURSEMENT IN RETURN
 TRANSACTIONS. A seller is entitled to a credit or reimbursement
 equal to the amount of sales tax refunded to a purchaser when the
 purchaser receives a full or partial refund of the sales price of a
 returned taxable item.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a refund of or credit for taxes that are paid on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A refund of or credit for taxes that are
 paid before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the taxes were paid, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1199 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1199 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor