Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1206 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1206


 AN ACT
 relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 508.141, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (d-1), and (d-2) and amending Subsection
 (d) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  If a parole panel requires, as a condition of release,
 that an inmate complete a specific department rehabilitation
 program before release, the department shall place the inmate in
 the program specified by the parole panel, except that the
 department may place the inmate in a different program with the
 approval of the parole panel.
 (d) A parole panel may release an inmate on parole during
 the parole month established for the inmate, or during any
 applicable range of dates established under Subsection (d-1), if
 the panel determines that the inmate's release will not increase
 the likelihood of harm to the public.
 (d-1)  A parole panel that, as a condition of release,
 requires an inmate to complete a specific department rehabilitation
 program shall specify a range of dates, based on the date the inmate
 is likely to have completed the specified program, during which the
 department may release the inmate, if the inmate has:
 (1)  successfully completed the program specified by
 the parole panel; and
 (2)  satisfied all other conditions of release
 specified by the parole panel.
 (d-2)  The range of dates specified by the parole panel under
 Subsection (d-1) may not begin earlier than the 45th day before any
 applicable release date established for the inmate and must be a
 range of at least 30 days.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to any
 inmate who is confined in a facility operated by or under contract
 with the Texas Department of Criminal Justice on or after the
 effective date of this Act, regardless of when the inmate's period
 of confinement began.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1206 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2009, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2009, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1206 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 1, one present not voting; May 23, 2009, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor