Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1217 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro S.B. No. 1217
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2009; March 13, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 17, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an autism program to provide services to
 children with autism spectrum disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 117, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 117.075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 117.075.  AUTISM PROGRAM. (a)  To the extent
 appropriated money is available for the purpose, the department
 shall provide services to children not younger than three or older
 than eight years of age who are diagnosed with autism spectrum
 disorder, to enhance communication, social, and independent living
 skills so that the children may fully participate in society.
 (b)  The services must include applied behavioral analysis
 and must complement and not duplicate services outlined in a
 child's individualized education plan developed by an independent
 school district.
 SECTION 2. The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall develop the autism program required
 under Section 117.075, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act,
 not later than January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *