Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1230 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1230
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1230 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Legislative Committee on Aging
 and other initiatives relating to the aging population of this
 state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 161, Human Resources Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapters G and H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER G.  LEGISLATIVE COMMITTEE ON AGING
 Sec. 161.251. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Committee" means the Legislative Committee on
 Aging.
 (2)  "Health and human services agency" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code.
 Sec. 161.252.  LEGISLATIVE COMMITTEE ON AGING ESTABLISHED.
 The Legislative Committee on Aging is established to:
 (1)  study issues relating to the aging population of
 Texas, including issues related to the health care, income,
 transportation, housing, education, and employment needs of that
 population; and
 (2) make recommendations to address those issues.
 Sec. 161.253.  COMPOSITION OF COMMITTEE; PRESIDING OFFICER.
 (a)  The committee is composed of:
 (1)  two members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (2)  two members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (3) two public members appointed by the governor.
 (b)  A member of the committee serves at the pleasure of the
 appointing official.
 (c)  The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint the presiding officer of the
 committee on an alternating basis.  The presiding officer shall
 serve a two-year term expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year.
 Sec. 161.254.  COMMITTEE POWERS AND DUTIES. (a)  The
 committee shall:
 (1)  meet at least biannually at the call of the
 presiding officer;
 (2)  conduct a continuing study of issues relating to
 the aging population, including issues that are affected by the
 demographic and geographic diversity of the aging population in
 this state;
 (3)  analyze the availability of, and unmet needs for,
 state and local services for the aging population; and
 (4)  request reports and other information relating to
 the aging population as necessary from the executive commissioner,
 the department, other health and human services agencies, the
 attorney general, and any other state agency.
 (b)  The executive commissioner, the department, other
 health and human services agencies, the attorney general, and any
 other applicable state agency shall fully cooperate with the
 committee in performing the committee's duties under this
 subchapter.
 (c)  The committee may issue process, in accordance with
 Section 301.024, Government Code, to compel attendance of witnesses
 and the production of books, records, documents, and instruments
 required by the committee.
 (d)  The committee shall use the existing staff resources of
 the senate and the house of representatives to assist the committee
 in performing its duties under this section.
 Sec. 161.255.  REPORT.  (a)  The committee shall report to
 the standing committees of the senate and the house of
 representatives having jurisdiction of issues related to the needs
 of the aging population not later than November 15 of each
 even-numbered year.
 (b) The report must include:
 (1)  a summary of the hearings and studies conducted by
 the committee during the preceding year;
 (2)  a statement of findings based on the hearings and
 studies conducted by the committee; and
 (3) recommendations for legislation.
 SUBCHAPTER H.  CERTAIN INITIATIVES RELATING TO AGING
 Sec. 161.301.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "fund" means
 the Chris Kyker Endowment for Seniors Fund established under this
 subchapter.
 Sec. 161.302.  CONTRACT TO PROVIDE OUTREACH AND INPUT
 RELATING TO AGING POPULATION.  (a)  The executive commissioner may
 contract with an entity to:
 (1)  conduct local forums throughout this state to
 solicit input on and discuss policies regarding aging-related
 issues, including issues that are affected by the demographic and
 geographic diversity of the aging population in this state;
 (2)  provide analysis, education, and research
 services with respect to aging-related issues; and
 (3)  identify problems encountered by the aging
 population in this state and develop and recommend to the executive
 commissioner and the legislature solutions to those problems.
 (b)  If a contract entered into under this section includes a
 provision that allows a person performing duties under the contract
 on behalf of the entity to receive a per diem for days spent
 performing those duties and to be reimbursed for travel expenses
 incurred in performing those duties, the per diem and reimbursement
 for travel expenses incurred must be paid at the same rate set in
 the General Appropriations Act for state employees.
 Sec. 161.303.  ESTABLISHMENT AND ADMINISTRATION OF FUND.
 (a)  The Chris Kyker Endowment for Seniors Fund is a special fund
 outside the state treasury held by the comptroller.
 (b) The comptroller shall deposit in the fund:
 (1) money appropriated to the fund;
 (2)  grants, gifts, and donations from any other public
 or private source; and
 (3)  income and interest, including depository
 interest, as provided by Subsection (f).
 (c)  The comptroller shall administer and manage the assets
 of the fund in accordance with this section and the rules adopted by
 the executive commissioner under Section 161.304(c).  In managing
 the assets of the fund, the comptroller may acquire, exchange,
 sell, supervise, manage, or retain, through procedures and subject
 to restrictions the comptroller considers appropriate, any kind of
 investment that a prudent investor, exercising reasonable care,
 skill, and caution, would acquire or retain in light of the
 purposes, terms, distribution requirements, and other
 circumstances of the fund then prevailing, taking into
 consideration the investment of all the assets of the fund rather
 than a single investment.
 (d)  The expenses of managing fund investments shall be paid
 from the fund.
 (e)  On request, the comptroller shall fully disclose all
 details concerning the investments of the fund.
 (f)  Interest earned on the fund shall be credited to the
 fund.
 Sec. 161.304.  USE OF FUND. (a)  The following may be used
 only to fund a contract entered into under Section 161.302:
 (1)  contributions to the fund described by Section
 161.303(b)(2); and
 (2)  income and interest earned on money in the fund
 described by Section 161.303(b)(3).
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (a), money in the fund
 may not be used for any purpose.
 (c)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules regarding
 distribution of money in the fund in accordance with this section.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than the 30th day after the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1) the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of
 the house of representatives shall appoint members of the
 Legislative Committee on Aging, as established by Section 161.252,
 Human Resources Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2) the lieutenant governor shall appoint the initial
 presiding officer under Subsection (c), Section 161.253, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) The Legislative Committee on Aging established by
 Section 161.252, Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, shall
 convene its initial meeting not later than November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *