Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1238 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 1238
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 1; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the Carrizo-Wilcox aquifer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "commission" means the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) The commission shall conduct a
 study regarding the impact on the entire Carrizo-Wilcox aquifer of
 rules and plans adopted by groundwater conservation districts in
 whose boundaries the aquifer is located and of determinations made
 by groundwater conservation districts in connection with the joint
 planning process relating to groundwater management areas in whose
 boundaries the aquifer is located. In conducting the study, the
 commission shall examine:
 (1) whether the rules and plans adopted by each
 groundwater conservation district:
 (A) are based on sound scientific principles;
 (B) adequately conserve and protect the aquifer
 and ensure the achievement of the applicable desired future
 condition for each part of the district; and
 (C) are likely to affect other groundwater
 conservation districts or groundwater management areas;
 (2) whether each district is enforcing substantial
 compliance with its rules;
 (3) whether the desired future conditions established
 under Section 36.108, Water Code, in each groundwater management
 area are reasonable and based on sound scientific principles, and
 whether the rules adopted by each district are designed to achieve
 the applicable desired future condition;
 (4) other long-term impacts of the applicable rules
 and plans on the aquifer, taking into consideration:
 (A) projected population and agricultural,
 municipal, and industrial demands for water from the aquifer;
 (B) the effect of the demands described by
 Paragraph (A) of this subdivision on the viability of the aquifer;
 (C) the social and economic consequences of any
 probable long-term impact on the aquifer; and
 (D) other appropriate factors as determined by
 commission rule; and
 (5) whether the presence of contaminants in the
 recharge area of the aquifer and the potential pollution of the
 aquifer are issues that should be addressed and, if so, by whom.
 (b) The Texas Water Development Board and the Bureau of
 Economic Geology of The University of Texas at Austin shall assist
 the commission in conducting the study under this section.
 (c) The commission may contract with any appropriate person
 to assist the commission in conducting the study under this
 section.
 SECTION 3. REPORT. Not later than December 31, 2012, the
 commission shall report the results of the study conducted under
 this Act to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of
 the house of representatives, and the standing committees in the
 senate and the house of representatives that have primary
 jurisdiction over natural resources. The report may include the
 commission's recommendations for legislation to address any areas
 of concern.
 SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. This Act expires August 31, 2013.
 SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *