Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1259 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1259
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 30, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1259 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the storage of records by the clerks of the supreme
 court and the courts of appeals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 51, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.0045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.0045.  ELECTRONIC OR MICROFILM STORAGE. (a)  In the
 performance of the duties imposed by Section 51.004, the clerk of
 the supreme court may maintain records and documents in an
 electronic storage format or on microfilm. A record or document
 stored electronically or on microfilm in accordance with this
 section is considered an original record or document.  If the clerk
 stores records or documents electronically or on microfilm, the
 clerk may destroy the originals or copies of the records or
 documents according to the retention policy described by Subsection
 (b).
 (b)  The clerk of the supreme court shall establish a records
 retention policy. The retention policy shall provide a plan for the
 storage and retention of records and documents and shall include a
 retention period to preserve the records and documents in
 accordance with applicable state law and rules of the supreme
 court.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, "electronic storage" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 51.105(c).
 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 51, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.205 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.205.  ELECTRONIC OR MICROFILM STORAGE. (a)  In the
 performance of the duties imposed by Section 51.204, the clerk of a
 court of appeals may maintain records and documents in an
 electronic storage format or on microfilm. A record or document
 stored electronically or on microfilm in accordance with this
 section is considered an original record or document.  If a clerk
 stores records or documents electronically or on microfilm, the
 clerk may destroy the originals or copies of the records or
 documents according to the retention policy described by Subsection
 (b).
 (b)  The clerk of a court of appeals shall establish a
 records retention policy. The retention policy shall provide a
 plan for the storage and retention of records and documents and
 shall include a retention period to preserve the records and
 documents in accordance with Section 51.204 and other applicable
 state law and rules of the court of appeals, the supreme court, or
 the court of criminal appeals.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, "electronic storage" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 51.105(c).
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 record or document maintained by the clerk of the Texas Supreme
 Court or the clerk of a court of appeals, as applicable, regardless
 of whether the record or document was received by the clerk before,
 on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *