Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1260 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 1260
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 1, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 1, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the abolishment of the Lower Concho River Water and Soil
 Conservation Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The Lower Concho River Water and Soil
 Conservation Authority is abolished as of the effective date of
 this Act, and any assets of the authority escheat to the state in
 the manner provided by Section 49.327, Water Code.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 3, page 1053, Special Laws, Acts of the
 46th Legislature, Regular Session, 1939, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *