By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1291 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; April 9, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 9, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1291 By: Van de Putte A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to access to certain counselors and therapists. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1451.114, Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 1451.114. SELECTION OF LICENSED PROFESSIONAL COUNSELOR. [(a)] An insured may select a licensed professional counselor to provide the services scheduled in the health insurance policy that are within the scope of the counselor's license. [(b) The health insurance policy may require that services of a licensed professional counselor must be recommended by a physician.] SECTION 2. Section 1451.116, Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 1451.116. SELECTION OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY THERAPIST. [(a)] An insured may select a marriage and family therapist to provide the services scheduled in the health insurance policy that are within the scope of the therapist's license. [(b) The health insurance policy may require that services of a marriage and family therapist must be recommended by a physician.] SECTION 3. This Act applies only to an insurance policy or contract or evidence of coverage that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2010. An insurance policy or contract or evidence of coverage delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2010, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *