Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1320 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1320
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1320 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice by a governmental entity regarding certain
 geospatial data products.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 2051, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. GEOSPATIAL DATA PRODUCTS
 Sec. 2051.101. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Geospatial data product" means a document,
 computer file, or Internet website that contains:
 (A) geospatial data;
 (B) a map; or
 (C)  information about a service involving
 geospatial data or a map.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 2051.041.
 (3)  "Registered professional land surveyor" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 1071.002, Occupations Code.
 Sec. 2051.102.  NOTICE REQUIRED.  (a)  A governmental entity
 shall include a notice as provided by this subchapter on each
 geospatial data product that:
 (1) is created or hosted by the governmental entity;
 (2) appears to represent property boundaries; and
 (3)  was not produced using information from an
 on-the-ground survey conducted by or under the supervision of a
 registered professional land surveyor.
 (b)  The notice required under Subsection (a) must be in
 substantially the following form:
 This product is for informational purposes and may not have
 been prepared for or be suitable for legal, engineering, or
 surveying purposes. It does not represent an on-the-ground survey
 and represents only the approximate relative location of property
 boundaries.
 (c) The notice required under Subsection (a) may:
 (1)  include language further defining the limits of
 liability of a geospatial data product producer;
 (2)  apply to a geospatial data product that contains
 more than one map; or
 (3)  for a notice that applies to a geospatial data
 product that is or is on an Internet website, be included on a
 separate page that requires the person accessing the website to
 agree to the terms of the notice before accessing the geospatial
 data product.
 SECTION 2. For geospatial data products that are printed
 documents, Section 2051.102, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to a document printed on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A document printed before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the document was
 printed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *