By: Nelson S.B. No. 1325 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 6, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1325 By: Huffman A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of a mental health intervention program for military veterans. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.076 to read as follows: Sec. 1001.076. MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM FOR VETERANS. (a) In this section, "veteran" means a person who: (1) has served in: (A) the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or marine corps of the United States; (B) the state military forces as defined by Section 431.001, Government Code; or (C) an auxiliary service of one of those branches of the armed forces; and (2) has been honorably discharged from the branch of the service in which the person served. (b) The department shall develop a mental health intervention program for veterans. The program must provide for peer-to-peer counseling. (c) The department shall solicit and train volunteers to provide the peer-to-peer counseling. SECTION 2. The Department of State Health Services shall develop the mental health intervention program for veterans as required by Section 1001.076, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2010. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *