Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1325 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1325


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a mental health intervention program
 for military veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.076.  MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM FOR VETERANS. (a)  In
 this section, "veteran" means a person who:
 (1) has served in:
 (A)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
 marine corps of the United States;
 (B)  the state military forces as defined by
 Section 431.001, Government Code; or
 (C)  an auxiliary service of one of those branches
 of the armed forces; and
 (2)  has been honorably discharged from the branch of
 the service in which the person served.
 (b)  The department shall develop a mental health
 intervention program for veterans. The program must provide for
 peer-to-peer counseling.
 (c)  The department shall solicit and train volunteers to
 provide the peer-to-peer counseling.
 SECTION 2. The Department of State Health Services shall
 develop the mental health intervention program for veterans as
 required by Section 1001.076, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1325 passed the Senate on
 April 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1325 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor