Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1327 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1327
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of surplus data processing equipment of
 a university system or an institution or agency of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2175.304, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsections (b) and (c), a university
 system or institution or agency of higher education included within
 the definition of "state agency" under Section 2151.002 may donate
 data processing equipment that is surplus property to a public or
 private hospital located in a rural county. For purposes of this
 subsection, "rural county" has the meaning assigned by Section
 487.301.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *