Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1328 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1328
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 6, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1328 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the feasibility of providing vaccines to
 first responders deployed to a disaster area.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) In this Act:
 (1) "Department" means the Department of State Health
 Services.
 (2) "Disaster" means:
 (A) a public health disaster as defined by
 Section 81.003, Health and Safety Code;
 (B) a natural or man-made disaster;
 (C) a terrorist attack;
 (D) a hostile military or paramilitary action;
 (E) an extraordinary law enforcement emergency;
 or
 (F) any other state of disaster declared under
 Chapter 418, Government Code.
 (3) "First responder" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 421.095, Government Code.
 (b) The department shall conduct a study to determine the
 feasibility of providing vaccines to:
 (1) a first responder who may be exposed to
 vaccine-preventable diseases during the responder's deployment to
 a disaster area; and
 (2) the immediate family members of a first responder
 to whom the first responder may transmit a vaccine-preventable
 disease after deployment to a disaster area.
 (c) The study must consider the feasibility of providing the
 following vaccines:
 (1) the hepatitis B vaccine for first responders who
 may be in direct contact with blood and other bodily fluids;
 (2) a tetanus-containing vaccine; and
 (3) other vaccines or biologicals recommended by the
 Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for disasters.
 (d) The department shall:
 (1) assess the vaccination status of first responders
 and their immediate family members in this state;
 (2) assess workplace immunization policies and
 insurance coverage for first responders;
 (3) make recommendations on educating first
 responders and their immediate family members about available
 options to obtain immunization services, regardless of insurance
 coverage;
 (4) assess the current ability of the department, in
 conjunction with local health departments, to provide vaccines to
 first responders and their immediate family members who are
 uninsured or underinsured;
 (5) identify and recommend funding sources for the
 procurement of recommended vaccines for first responders and their
 immediate family members who are uninsured or underinsured; and
 (6) evaluate the potential use and cost of providing
 other biologicals, such as immune globulin, to be used in
 conjunction with vaccines to prevent the spread of
 vaccine-preventable diseases.
 (e) The statewide wellness coordinator designated under
 Subsection (a), Section 664.053, Government Code, shall assist the
 department in obtaining data from state agencies that employ first
 responders by:
 (1) consulting with the wellness liaison identified
 under Subsection (d), Section 664.053, Government Code, for a state
 agency that employs first responders to gain study-related
 information from the state agency;
 (2) assessing the readiness of each state agency to
 administer vaccines to the agency's first responders before
 deployment to a disaster area; and
 (3) providing to the department appropriate
 information from state agencies regarding the current immunization
 policies of those agencies.
 (f) A state agency that provides data to the department for
 purposes of the study shall ensure that the data does not identify a
 first responder or family member of a first responder to whom the
 data pertains.
 (g) Not later than August 1, 2011, the department shall
 submit to the legislature a written report containing the findings
 of the study and the department's recommendations.
 (h) This section expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *