Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1329 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1329
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1329 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of certain license holders to control
 food-borne illnesses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 431, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 431.085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.085.  REPORTABLE PATHOGENS AND REQUIRED TESTING.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Food manufacturer" and "food wholesaler" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 431.221.
 (2)  "Public health disaster" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 81.003.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission, by rule, may require a food manufacturer or
 food wholesaler to test products specified by the department for
 pathogenic microorganisms or toxins injurious to human health.
 (c)  A food manufacturer or food wholesaler in this state
 shall report test results of products that test positive for
 pathogenic microorganisms or toxins injurious to human health as
 provided by department rule.
 (d)  The department shall maintain and revise as necessary
 the list of reportable food-borne pathogenic microorganisms or
 toxins. The list must include salmonella.
 (e)  In a public health disaster, the commissioner may
 require testing for or reports of food-borne pathogenic
 microorganisms or toxins from providers without a department rule
 or other action.  The commissioner shall issue appropriate
 instructions relating to complying with the testing and reporting
 requirements of this section.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 431.2211, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person is not required to hold a license under this
 subchapter if the person is:
 (1) a person, firm, or corporation that only harvests,
 packages, or washes[, or ships] raw fruits or vegetables for
 shipment at the location of harvest;
 (2) an individual who only sells prepackaged
 nonperishable foods, including dietary supplements, from a private
 home as a direct seller;
 (3) a person who holds a license under Chapter 432 and
 who only engages in conduct within the scope of that license; or
 (4) a restaurant that provides food for immediate
 human consumption to a political subdivision or to a licensed
 nonprofit organization if the restaurant would not otherwise be
 required to hold a license under this subchapter.
 SECTION 3. A person is not required to perform tests or
 report the results of tests performed under Section 431.085, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, before January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 4. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 (b) Section 2 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2010.
 * * * * *