Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1334 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1334


 AN ACT
 relating to continuation of the intercollegiate athletics fee for
 students at Prairie View A&M University.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (f), Section 54.5393, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (f) This section expires September 1, 2013, except that this
 section does not expire if before the end of the 2012-2013 academic
 year the board of regents issues bonds that are payable wholly or
 partly from the fee.  If the board of regents issues bonds as
 described by this subsection, the fee authorized by this section
 may not be imposed in any semester or session beginning after the
 date on which all of those bonds, including refunding bonds for the
 bonds, have been fully paid.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1334 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1334 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor