Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1342 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1342
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1342 By: Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorization for an exemption from tuition and fees
 charged by a junior college district for employees of the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0851 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0851.  TUITION EXEMPTION FOR DISTRICT EMPLOYEES.
 The governing board of a junior college district may exempt a
 district employee who enrolls in courses offered by the district
 from the payment of all or part of the tuition or fees charged to a
 student at a junior college by the district.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *