Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1351 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 1351
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1351 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the terms of the members of the Texas Transportation
 Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Effective January 1, 2010, Section 201.052,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve
 two-year [staggered six-year] terms, with the terms [of either one
 or two members] expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 SECTION 2. Effective January 1, 2014, Section 201.052,
 Transportation Code, is reenacted to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve
 staggered six-year terms, with the terms of either one or two
 members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 SECTION 3. The term of a member of the Texas Transportation
 Commission serving on December 31, 2010, expires on February 1,
 2011.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *