Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1356 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1356
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 1, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1356 By: Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a fee associated with the assignment of a vehicle
 identification number by the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 501.033, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  If the auto theft unit of a county or municipal law
 enforcement agency  conducts an inspection required by the
 department under this section, the agency may impose a fee of $40.
 The county or municipal treasurer shall credit the fee to the
 general fund of the county or municipality, as applicable, to
 defray the agency's cost associated with the inspection.  The fee
 shall be waived by the department or agency imposing the fee if the
 person applying under this section is the current registered owner.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *