Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1362 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R8757 CAS-F
 By: Shapiro S.B. No. 1362


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a Texas Youth Commission comprehensive plan to improve
 student reading skills and behavior.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 30, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 30.106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 30.106.  READING AND BEHAVIOR PLAN. (a) Because
 learning and behavior are inextricably linked and learning and
 improved behavior correlate with decreased recidivism rates, the
 Texas Youth Commission shall not only fulfill the commission's
 duties under state and federal law to provide general and special
 educational services to students in commission educational
 programs but also shall implement a comprehensive plan to improve
 the reading skills and behavior of those students.
 (b)  To improve the reading skills of students in Texas Youth
 Commission educational programs, the commission shall:
 (1)  adopt a reliable battery of reading assessments
 that:
 (A)  are based on a normative sample appropriate
 to students in commission educational programs;
 (B)  are designed to be administered on an
 individual basis; and
 (C) allow school employees to:
 (i)  evaluate performance in each essential
 component of effective reading instruction, including phonemic
 awareness, phonics, fluency, vocabulary, and comprehension; and
 (ii)  monitor progress in areas of
 deficiency specific to an individual student; and
 (iii) provide reading performance data;
 (2)  administer the assessments adopted under
 Subdivision (1):
 (A)  at periodic intervals not to exceed 12
 months, to each student in a commission educational program; and
 (B)  at least 15 days and not more than 30 days
 before a student is released from the commission;
 (3)  provide at least 60 minutes per school day of
 individualized reading instruction to each student in a commission
 educational program who exhibits deficits in reading on the
 assessments adopted under Subdivision (1):
 (A)  by trained educators with expertise in
 teaching reading to struggling adolescent readers; and
 (B)  through the use of scientifically based,
 peer-reviewed reading curricula that:
 (i)  have proven effective in improving the
 reading performance of struggling adolescent readers;
 (ii)  address individualized and
 differentiated reading goals; and
 (iii)  include each of the essential
 components of effective reading instruction, including phonemic
 awareness, phonics, fluency, vocabulary, and comprehension;
 (4)  require each teacher in a commission regular or
 special educational program who teaches English language arts,
 reading, mathematics, science, social studies, or career and
 technology education to be trained in incorporating content area
 reading instruction using empirically validated instructional
 methods that are appropriate for struggling adolescent readers; and
 (5)  evaluate the effectiveness of the commission's
 plan to increase reading skills according to the following
 criteria:
 (A)  an adequate rate of improvement in reading
 performance, as measured by monthly progress monitoring using
 curricular-based assessments in each of the essential components of
 effective reading instruction, including phonemic awareness,
 phonics, fluency, vocabulary, and comprehension;
 (B)  a significant annual rate of improvement in
 reading performance, disaggregated by subgroups designated under
 commission rule, as measured using the battery of reading
 assessments adopted under Subdivision (1); and
 (C)  student ratings of the quality and impact of
 the reading plan under this subsection, as measured on a student
 self-reporting instrument.
 (c)  To increase the positive social behaviors of students in
 Texas Youth Commission educational programs and to create an
 educational environment that facilitates learning, the commission
 shall:
 (1)  adopt system-wide classroom and individual
 positive behavior supports that incorporate a continuum of
 prevention and intervention strategies that:
 (A) are based on current behavioral research; and
 (B)  are systematically and individually applied
 to students consistent with the demonstrated level of need;
 (2)  require each teacher and other educational staff
 member in a commission educational program to be trained in
 implementing the positive behavior support system adopted under
 Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  adopt valid assessment techniques to evaluate the
 effectiveness of the positive behavior support system according to
 the following criteria:
 (A)  documentation of school-related disciplinary
 referrals, disaggregated by the type, location, and time of
 infraction and by subgroups designated under commission rule;
 (B)  documentation of school-related disciplinary
 actions, including time-out, placement in security, and use of
 restraints and other aversive control measures, disaggregated by
 subgroups designated under commission rule;
 (C)  validated measurement of systemic positive
 behavioral support interventions; and
 (D)  the number of minutes students are out of the
 regular classroom because of disciplinary reasons.
 (d)  The Texas Youth Commission shall consult with faculty
 from institutions of higher education who have expertise in reading
 instruction for adolescents, in juvenile corrections, and in
 positive behavior supports to develop and implement the plan under
 Subsections (b) and (c).
 (e)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the Texas Youth
 Commission shall report to the legislature concerning:
 (1)  the effectiveness of the commission's reading plan
 based on the criteria specified by Subsection (b)(5); and
 (2)  the implementation of the positive behavior
 support system plan under Subsection (c).
 (f)  Not later than December 1, 2012, the Texas Youth
 Commission shall report to the legislature concerning the
 effectiveness of the positive behavior support system based on the
 criteria specified by Subsection (c)(3).
 (g)  Subsections (e) and (f) and this subsection expire
 January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than November 1, 2009, the Texas
 Youth Commission shall adopt the battery of reading assessments as
 required by Section 30.106(b), Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 (b) Not later than January 1, 2010, the Texas Youth
 Commission shall begin administering the battery of reading
 assessments as required by Section 30.106(b), Education Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.