Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1369 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1369


 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of attorneys ad litem and to
 court-appointed volunteer advocates in certain suits affecting the
 parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 74.092, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 74.092. DUTIES OF LOCAL ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE. (a) A
 local administrative judge, for the courts for which the judge
 serves as local administrative judge, shall:
 (1) implement and execute the local rules of
 administration, including the assignment, docketing, transfer, and
 hearing of cases;
 (2) appoint any special or standing committees
 necessary or desirable for court management and administration;
 (3) promulgate local rules of administration if the
 other judges do not act by a majority vote;
 (4) recommend to the regional presiding judge any
 needs for assignment from outside the county to dispose of court
 caseloads;
 (5) supervise the expeditious movement of court
 caseloads, subject to local, regional, and state rules of
 administration;
 (6) provide the supreme court and the office of court
 administration requested statistical and management information;
 (7) set the hours and places for holding court in the
 county;
 (8) supervise the employment and performance of
 nonjudicial personnel;
 (9) supervise the budget and fiscal matters of the
 local courts, subject to local rules of administration;
 (10) coordinate and cooperate with any other local
 administrative judge in the district in the assignment of cases in
 the courts' concurrent jurisdiction for the efficient operation of
 the court system and the effective administration of justice; [and]
 (11) establish and maintain a list of all attorneys
 qualified to serve as an attorney ad litem; and
 (12) perform other duties as may be directed by the
 chief justice or a regional presiding judge.
 (b)  A list of attorneys ad litem maintained under Subsection
 (a)(11) must contain the names of all attorneys who:
 (1)  meet any statutory or other requirements to serve
 as an attorney ad litem; and
 (2)  have registered to serve as attorney ad litem with
 a court for which the judge maintaining the list serves as local
 administrative judge.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 74, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 74.098 to read as follows:
 Sec. 74.098.  APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEYS AD LITEM; MAINTENANCE
 OF LIST. (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), in each case in
 which the appointment of an attorney ad litem is necessary, a court
 shall appoint the attorney whose name appears first on the list of
 attorneys ad litem maintained by the local administrative judge for
 that court as required by Section 74.092.
 (b)  The court may appoint an attorney included on the list
 whose name does not appear first on the list or an attorney not
 included on the list if the appointment of that attorney as attorney
 ad litem is:
 (1)  required on a complex matter because the attorney
 possesses relevant specialized education, training, certification,
 or skill;
 (2)  made pursuant to the Family Code, Health and
 Safety Code, Human Resources Code, Texas Trust Code (Subtitle B,
 Title 9, Property Code), or Texas Probate Code; or
 (3) agreed on by the parties and approved by the court.
 (c)  After an attorney has been appointed as an attorney ad
 litem from the list, the local administrative judge shall place
 that attorney's name at the end of the list.
 SECTION 3. Subdivision (2), Section 264.601, Family Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (2) "Volunteer advocate program" means a
 volunteer-based, nonprofit program that:
 (A) provides advocacy services to abused or
 neglected children with the goal of obtaining a permanent placement
 for a child that is in the child's best interest; and
 (B)  complies with recognized standards for
 volunteer advocate programs.
 SECTION 4. Section 264.602, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (a) The statewide organization with which the attorney
 general contracts under Section 264.603 shall contract for services
 with eligible volunteer advocate programs to provide advocacy
 services to abused or neglected children [expand the existing
 services of the programs].
 (f)  Expenses incurred by a volunteer advocate program to
 promote public awareness of the need for volunteer advocates or to
 explain the work performed by volunteer advocates that are paid
 with money from the attorney general volunteer advocate program
 account under Section 504.611, Transportation Code, are not
 considered administrative expenses for the purpose of Section
 264.603(b).
 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 264.603, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The attorney general shall contract with one statewide
 organization of individuals or groups of individuals who have
 expertise in the dynamics of child abuse and neglect and experience
 in operating volunteer advocate programs to provide training,
 technical assistance, and evaluation services for the benefit of
 local volunteer advocate programs. The contract shall:
 (1) include [require] measurable goals and objectives
 relating to the number of:
 (A) volunteer advocates in the program; and
 (B)  children receiving services from the
 program; and
 (2)  follow practices designed to ensure compliance
 with standards referenced in the contract [for expanding local
 volunteer child advocate programs to areas of the state in which
 those programs do not exist].
 SECTION 6. Subsection (a), Section 264.604, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person is eligible for a contract under Section
 264.602 only if the person is a public or private nonprofit entity
 that operates a volunteer advocate program that:
 (1) uses individuals appointed as volunteer advocates
 or guardians ad litem by the court to provide for the needs of
 abused or neglected children;
 (2) has provided court-appointed advocacy services
 for at least six months [two years];
 (3) provides court-appointed advocacy services for at
 least 10 children each month; and
 (4) has demonstrated that the program has local
 judicial support.
 SECTION 7. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 264.607, Family
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 8. Not later than December 1, 2009, each local
 administrative judge shall establish a list of attorneys registered
 and qualified to serve as attorney ad litem in a court for which the
 judge serves as local administrative judge as required by Section
 74.092, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 9. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the appointment of an attorney ad litem on or after December 1,
 2009.
 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1369 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1369 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor