By: Lucio S.B. No. 1373 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on International Relations and Trade; April 2, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 2, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the operation and continuation of the law authorizing the issuance of oversize or overweight vehicle permits by certain port authorities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) Subsection (b), Section 623.214, Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Fees collected under Subsection (a), minus administrative costs, shall be used solely to provide funds for the maintenance and improvement of state highways subject to this subchapter. The [payments provided for under Section 623.213 less] administrative costs, which shall not exceed 15 percent of the fees collected, may be retained by the port authority. The [Such] fees, less administrative costs, shall be deposited in State Highway Fund 6. (b) Sections 623.213 and 623.219, Transportation Code, are repealed. SECTION 2. Subchapter K, Chapter 623, Transportation Code, is reenacted and amended to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER K. PORT AUTHORITY PERMITS Sec. 623.210. OPTIONAL PROCEDURE. This subchapter provides an optional procedure for the issuance of a permit for the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles carrying cargo on state highways located in counties contiguous to the Gulf of Mexico or a bay or inlet opening into the gulf and bordering the United Mexican States. Sec. 623.211. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "port authority" means a port authority created or operating under Section 52, Article III, or Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution. Sec. 623.212. PERMITS BY PORT AUTHORITY. The department may authorize a port authority to issue permits for the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles carrying cargo on state highways located in counties contiguous to the Gulf of Mexico or a bay or inlet opening into the gulf and bordering the United Mexican States. Sec. 623.213. [MAINTENANCE CONTRACTS. A port authority issuing permits under this subchapter shall make payments to the department to provide funds for the maintenance of state highways subject to this subchapter. [Sec. 623.214.] PERMIT FEES. (a) A port authority may collect a fee for permits issued under this subchapter. Such fees shall not exceed $80 per trip. (b) Fees collected under Subsection (a), minus administrative costs, shall be used solely to provide funds for the maintenance and improvement of state highways subject to this subchapter. The [payments provided for under Section 623.213 less] administrative costs, which shall not exceed 15 percent of the fees collected, may be retained by the port authority. The [Such] fees, less administrative costs, shall be deposited in State Highway Fund 6. Sec. 623.214 [623.215]. PERMIT REQUIREMENTS. (a) A permit issued under this subchapter must include: (1) the name of the applicant; (2) the date of issuance; (3) the signature of the director of the port authority; (4) a statement of the kind of cargo being transported over State Highways 48 and 4 between the Gateway International Bridge and the entrance to the Port of Brownsville, or over State Highways 48 and 4 and United States Highways 77 and 83 between Veterans International Bridge at Los Tomates and the entrance to the Port of Brownsville, the maximum weight and dimensions of the equipment, and the kind and weight of each commodity to be transported provided the gross weight of such equipment and commodities shall not exceed 125,000 pounds; (5) a statement of any condition on which the permit is issued; (6) a statement that the cargo shall be transported over the most direct route from the Gateway International Bridge or the Veterans International Bridge at Los Tomates to the entrance of the Port of Brownsville using State Highways 48 and 4 or United States Highways 77 and 83; (7) the name of the driver of the vehicle in which the cargo is to be transported; and (8) the location where the cargo was loaded. (b) A port authority shall report to the department all permits issued under this subchapter. Sec. 623.215 [623.216]. TIME OF MOVEMENT. A permit issued under this subchapter shall specify the time in which movement authorized by the permit is allowed. Sec. 623.216 [623.217]. SPEED LIMIT. Movement authorized by a permit issued under this subchapter shall not exceed the posted speed limit or 55 miles per hour, whichever is less. Violation of this provision shall constitute a moving violation. Sec. 623.217 [623.218]. ENFORCEMENT. The Department of Public Safety shall have authority to enforce the provisions of this subchapter. [Sec. 623.219. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires June 1, 2009.] SECTION 3. (a) Section 1 of this Act takes effect only if this Act takes effect on or before June 1, 2009. (b) Section 2 of this Act takes effect only if this Act takes effect on or after June 2, 2009. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *