Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1374 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1374


 AN ACT
 relating to annual reports by the Texas Juvenile Probation
 Commission on the operations and conditions of probation services
 in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 141.024, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commission shall report annually to the governor and
 the legislature on the commission's operations and the condition of
 probation services in the state during the previous year. The
 report:
 (1) may include recommendations; and
 (2) must include:
 (A)  an evaluation of the effectiveness of the
 community-based programs operated under Section 54.0401, Family
 Code; and
 (B)  information comparing the cost of a child
 participating in a program described by Paragraph (A) with the cost
 of committing the child to the Texas Youth Commission.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1374 passed the Senate on
 May 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1374 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor