Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1389 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1389
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 1, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1389 By: Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the penalty for the offense of reckless driving.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 545.401, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g)
 to read as follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (e), an [An] offense
 under this section is a misdemeanor punishable by:
 (1) a fine not to exceed $200;
 (2) confinement in county jail for not more than 30
 days; or
 (3) both the fine and the confinement.
 (e)  If an offense under this section results in the serious
 bodily injury or death of an operator or passenger of another motor
 vehicle, the offense is a Class B misdemeanor.
 (f) The court may:
 (1)  order that the driver's license of a person
 convicted of an offense under Subsection (e) be suspended for not
 less than 30 days beginning on the date of conviction; and
 (2)  require the person to attend and present proof
 that the person successfully completed a driving safety course
 approved under Chapter 1001, Education Code, before the person's
 driver's license may be reinstated.
 (g)  A judge, acting under Article 42.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, who elects to place a defendant on community supervision
 under that article may require the defendant to attend and present
 proof that the defendant successfully completed a driving safety
 course approved under Chapter 1001, Education Code.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense was committed before that
 date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *