Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1399 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1399
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 2, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1399 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to delinquent payment of an alcoholic beverage retailer's
 account for liquor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 102.32, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The commission or administrator may not accept the
 voluntary cancellation or suspension of a permit or allow a permit
 to be renewed or transferred if the permit holder is delinquent in
 the payment of an account for liquor under this section.  A person
 whose permit is canceled by the commission or whose permit has
 expired is not eligible to hold any other permit or license under
 this code until the person has cured any delinquency of the person
 under this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *