Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1402 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 1402 81R2672 DRH-D By: Hinojosa  State Affairs  4/7/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Recently, there has been increased constituent outcry due to lack of oversight with "small town" election administration in small political subdivisions that compromises the integrity of the election process and affects constituent participation at the local level.   Improper election administration can be seen as the unlawful appointment of election judges and clerks and in the selection of inexperienced election workers.   As proposed,  S.B. 1402 requires the governing body of a certain political subdivision to request an election services contract with the county elections administrator to perform all duties and functions of the political subdivision in relation to a certain election if the political subdivision receives a petition requesting the contract signed by a number of registered voters residing in the political subdivision that is equal to or exceeds one percent of all votes cast in the most recent general election held by the political subdivision.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.    SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter D, Chapter 31, Elections Code, by adding Section 31.0925, as follows:   Sec. 31.0925. REQUEST FOR SERVICES REQUIRED. (a) Provides that this section applies only to a political subdivision located entirely in a county with a population of more than 500,000 that is served by a county elections administrator and that does not contain a municipality with a population of more than 150,000.   (b) Requires the governing body of a political subdivision to request an election services contract with the county elections administrator to perform all duties and functions of the political subdivision in relation to an election that is authorized to be transferred under this subchapter if the political subdivision receives a petition requesting the contract signed by a number of registered voters residing in the political subdivision that is equal to or exceeds one percent of all votes cast in the most recent general election held by the political subdivision.   (c) Requires that a petition under this section be submitted to the clerk of the political subdivision not later than January 1, 2010.   (d) Provides that this subsection expires January 1, 2020.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009. 

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1402

81R2672 DRH-D By: Hinojosa

 State Affairs

 4/7/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Recently, there has been increased constituent outcry due to lack of oversight with "small town" election administration in small political subdivisions that compromises the integrity of the election process and affects constituent participation at the local level.

 

Improper election administration can be seen as the unlawful appointment of election judges and clerks and in the selection of inexperienced election workers.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 1402 requires the governing body of a certain political subdivision to request an election services contract with the county elections administrator to perform all duties and functions of the political subdivision in relation to a certain election if the political subdivision receives a petition requesting the contract signed by a number of registered voters residing in the political subdivision that is equal to or exceeds one percent of all votes cast in the most recent general election held by the political subdivision.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. 

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter D, Chapter 31, Elections Code, by adding Section 31.0925, as follows:

 

Sec. 31.0925. REQUEST FOR SERVICES REQUIRED. (a) Provides that this section applies only to a political subdivision located entirely in a county with a population of more than 500,000 that is served by a county elections administrator and that does not contain a municipality with a population of more than 150,000.

 

(b) Requires the governing body of a political subdivision to request an election services contract with the county elections administrator to perform all duties and functions of the political subdivision in relation to an election that is authorized to be transferred under this subchapter if the political subdivision receives a petition requesting the contract signed by a number of registered voters residing in the political subdivision that is equal to or exceeds one percent of all votes cast in the most recent general election held by the political subdivision.

 

(c) Requires that a petition under this section be submitted to the clerk of the political subdivision not later than January 1, 2010.

 

(d) Provides that this subsection expires January 1, 2020.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.