Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1402 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1402
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 15, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1402 By: Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring certain political subdivisions to enter a
 contract with the county elections administrator to perform
 election services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.0925 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.0925.  REQUEST FOR SERVICES REQUIRED. (a)  This
 section applies only to a political subdivision located entirely in
 a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than 500,000 that is
 served by a county elections administrator; and
 (2)  that does not contain a municipality with a
 population of more than 150,000.
 (b)  The governing body of a political subdivision shall
 request an election services contract with the county elections
 administrator to perform all duties and functions of the political
 subdivision in relation to an election that may be transferred
 under this subchapter if the political subdivision receives a
 petition requesting the contract signed by a number of registered
 voters residing in the political subdivision that is equal to or
 exceeds one percent of all votes cast in the most recent general
 election held by the political subdivision.
 (c)  A petition under this section must be submitted to the
 clerk of the political subdivision before January 1 of the year in
 which the election to be administered under the requested election
 services contract will be held.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *