Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1415 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R6366 YDB-F
 By: Hegar S.B. No. 1415


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a pilot program on deferred
 disciplinary action.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.1607 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.1607.  PILOT PROGRAM ON DEFERRAL OF FINAL
 DISCIPLINARY ACTION.  (a)  In this section, "deferred disciplinary
 action" means a final disciplinary action against a person licensed
 or regulated under this chapter that is deferred by the board as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  Not later than February 1, 2010, the board shall
 determine the feasibility of conducting a pilot program designed to
 evaluate the efficacy and effect on the public's protection of
 board deferral of disciplinary action against a person licensed or
 regulated under this chapter in cases in which the board proposes to
 impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
 revocation of a license. If the board determines the pilot program
 is feasible, the board shall develop and implement the pilot
 program not later than February 1, 2011. The pilot program must
 conclude not later than January 1, 2014.
 (c)  The pilot program may not include cases in which the
 board proposes to issue a reprimand or to deny, suspend, or revoke a
 license.
 (d)  During the time the pilot program is implemented and for
 any action or complaint for which the board proposes to impose a
 sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
 revocation of a license, the board may:
 (1)  defer final disciplinary action the board has
 proposed against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter
 if the person conforms to conditions imposed by the board,
 including any condition the board could impose as a condition of
 probation under Section 301.468; and
 (2)  if the person successfully meets the imposed
 conditions, dismiss the complaint.
 (e)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a
 deferred disciplinary action by the board under the pilot program
 is not confidential and is subject to disclosure in accordance with
 Chapter 552, Government Code. If the person successfully meets the
 conditions imposed by the board in deferring final disciplinary
 action and the board dismisses the action or complaint, the
 deferred disciplinary action of the board is confidential to the
 same extent as a complaint filed under Section 301.466.
 (f)  The board may contract with a third party to evaluate
 the pilot program established under this section.
 (g)  The board shall appoint an advisory committee to assist
 the board in overseeing the pilot program and its evaluation. The
 committee must include representatives of public advocacy
 organizations.
 (h) This section expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.