By: Hegar S.B. No. 1415 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1415 By: Deuell A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to certain corrective actions by the Texas Board of Nursing, including a pilot program on deferred disciplinary action; providing corrective actions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 301.1607 to read as follows: Sec. 301.1607. PILOT PROGRAM ON DEFERRAL OF FINAL DISCIPLINARY ACTION. (a) In this section, "deferred disciplinary action" means a final disciplinary action against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter that is deferred by the board as provided by this section. (b) Not later than February 1, 2010, the board shall determine the feasibility of conducting a pilot program designed to evaluate the efficacy and effect on the public's protection of board deferral of disciplinary action against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter in cases in which the board proposes to impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or revocation of a license. If the board determines the pilot program is feasible, the board shall develop and implement the pilot program not later than February 1, 2011. The pilot program must conclude not later than January 1, 2014. (c) The pilot program may not include cases in which the board proposes to issue a reprimand or to deny, suspend, or revoke a license. (d) During the time the pilot program is implemented and for any action or complaint for which the board proposes to impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or revocation of a license, the board may: (1) defer final disciplinary action the board has proposed against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter if the person conforms to conditions imposed by the board, including any condition the board could impose as a condition of probation under Section 301.468; and (2) if the person successfully meets the imposed conditions, dismiss the complaint. (e) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a deferred disciplinary action by the board under the pilot program is not confidential and is subject to disclosure in accordance with Chapter 552, Government Code. If the person successfully meets the conditions imposed by the board in deferring final disciplinary action and the board dismisses the action or complaint, the deferred disciplinary action of the board is confidential to the same extent as a complaint filed under Section 301.466. (f) The board may treat a deferred disciplinary action taken against a nurse under this section as a prior disciplinary action against the nurse when considering the imposition of a sanction for a subsequent violation of this chapter or a rule or order adopted under this chapter. (g) The board may contract with a third party to evaluate the pilot program established under this section. (h) The board shall appoint an advisory committee to assist the board in overseeing the pilot program and its evaluation. The committee must include representatives of public advocacy organizations. (i) This section expires September 1, 2014. SECTION 2. Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Subchapter N to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER N. CORRECTIVE ACTION PROCEEDING Sec. 301.651. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "corrective action" means a fine or remedial education imposed under Section 301.652. Sec. 301.652. IMPOSITION OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. (a) The board may impose a corrective action on a person licensed or regulated under this chapter who violates this chapter or a rule or order adopted under this chapter. The corrective action: (1) may be a fine, remedial education, or any combination of a fine or remedial education; (2) is not a disciplinary action under Subchapter J; and (3) is subject to disclosure only to the extent a complaint is subject to disclosure under Section 301.466. (b) The board by rule shall adopt guidelines for the types of violations for which a corrective action may be imposed. Sec. 301.653. REPORT AND NOTICE OF VIOLATION AND CORRECTIVE ACTION. If the executive director determines that a person has committed a violation for which a corrective action may be imposed under the guidelines adopted under Section 301.652(b), the executive director may give written notice of the determination and recommendation for corrective action to the person subject to the corrective action. The notice may be given by certified mail. The notice must: (1) include a brief summary of the alleged violation; (2) state the recommended corrective action; and (3) inform the person of the person's options in responding to the notice. Sec. 301.654. RESPONSE. Not later than the 20th day after the date the person receives the notice under Section 301.653, the person may: (1) accept in writing the executive director's determination and recommended corrective action; or (2) reject the executive director's determination and recommended corrective action. Sec. 301.655. ACTION FOLLOWING RESPONSE. (a) If the person accepts the executive director's determination and satisfies the recommended corrective action, the case is closed. (b) If the person does not accept the executive director's determination and recommended corrective action as originally proposed or as modified by the board or fails to respond in a timely manner to the executive director's notice as provided by Section 301.654, the executive director shall: (1) terminate proceedings under this subchapter; and (2) dispose of the matter as a complaint under Subchapter J. Sec. 301.656. REPORT TO BOARD. The executive director shall report periodically to the board on the corrective actions imposed under this subchapter, including: (1) the number of corrective actions imposed; (2) the types of violations for which corrective actions were imposed; and (3) whether affected nurses accepted the corrective actions. Sec. 301.657. EFFECT ON ACCEPTANCE OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. (a) Except to the extent provided by this section, a person's acceptance of a corrective action under this subchapter does not constitute an admission of a violation but does constitute a plea of nolo contendere. (b) The board may treat a person's acceptance of corrective action as an admission of a violation if the board imposes a sanction on the person for a subsequent violation of this chapter or a rule or order adopted under this chapter. SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 301, Occupations Code, apply to actions for violations under Chapter 301 pending on the effective date of this Act or commenced on or after the effective date of this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *