Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1423 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 1423 81R9767 TRH-F By: Huffman  Business & Commerce  3/22/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, the Renewable Portfolio Standard (RPS) has been very successful in developing energy from wind power. However, Texas needs to develop other abundant renewable energy resources and take advantage of the economic development potential from other renewable energy technologies and opportunities. This diversity will allow Texas to continue its history of energy leadership.   As proposed,  S.B. 1423 amends Section 39.904, Utilities Code (Goal for Renewable Energy), the Renewable Portfolio Standard (RPS), and increases the 500 megawatt non-wind carve out to a goal of 3,000 megawatts of capacity.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.    SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Sections 39.904(a) and (o), Utilities Code, as follows:   (a) Requires the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state to total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2025, and requires the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to establish a goal, rather than a target, of 10,000 megawatts of installed renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. Requires PUC to establish a goal, rather than a target, of having at least 3,000, rather than 500, megawatts of capacity of the renewable energy technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this subsection after September 1, 2005, from a renewable energy technology other than a source using wind energy.    (o) Makes a conforming change.     SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2009.   

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1423

81R9767 TRH-F By: Huffman

 Business & Commerce

 3/22/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, the Renewable Portfolio Standard (RPS) has been very successful in developing energy from wind power. However, Texas needs to develop other abundant renewable energy resources and take advantage of the economic development potential from other renewable energy technologies and opportunities. This diversity will allow Texas to continue its history of energy leadership.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 1423 amends Section 39.904, Utilities Code (Goal for Renewable Energy), the Renewable Portfolio Standard (RPS), and increases the 500 megawatt non-wind carve out to a goal of 3,000 megawatts of capacity.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. 

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Sections 39.904(a) and (o), Utilities Code, as follows:

 

(a) Requires the cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state to total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2025, and requires the Public Utility Commission of Texas (PUC) to establish a goal, rather than a target, of 10,000 megawatts of installed renewable capacity by January 1, 2025. Requires PUC to establish a goal, rather than a target, of having at least 3,000, rather than 500, megawatts of capacity of the renewable energy technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this subsection after September 1, 2005, from a renewable energy technology other than a source using wind energy. 

 

(o) Makes a conforming change.

 

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2009.