Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1424 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1424
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1424 By: Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a person's eligibility to possess or carry a concealed
 handgun or other firearm.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (4), Section 411.171, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (4) "Convicted" means an adjudication of guilt or,
 except as provided in Section 411.1711, an order of deferred
 adjudication entered against a person by a court of competent
 jurisdiction whether or not the imposition of the sentence is
 subsequently probated and the person is discharged from community
 supervision. The term does not include an adjudication of guilt or
 an order of deferred adjudication that has been subsequently:
 (A) expunged; [or]
 (B) pardoned under the authority of a state or
 federal official; or
 (C)  otherwise vacated, set aside, annulled,
 invalidated, voided, or sealed under any state or federal law.
 SECTION 2. Section 411.172, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b) For the purposes of this section, an offense under the
 laws of this state, another state, or the United States is:
 (1) except as provided by Subsection (b-1), a felony
 if [the offense], at the time it is committed, the offense [of a
 person's application for a license to carry a concealed handgun]:
 (A) is designated by a law of this state as a
 felony;
 (B) contains all the elements of an offense
 designated by a law of this state as a felony; or
 (C) is punishable by confinement for one year or
 more in a penitentiary; and
 (2) a Class A misdemeanor if the offense is not a
 felony and confinement in a jail other than a state jail felony
 facility is affixed as a possible punishment.
 (b-1)  An offense is not considered a felony for purposes of
 Subsection (b)(1) if, at the time of a person's application for a
 license to carry a concealed handgun, the offense:
 (1)  is designated by a law of this state as a
 misdemeanor; or
 (2)  does not contain all the elements of any offense
 designated by a law of this state as a felony.
 SECTION 3. Section 46.04, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  For the purposes of this section, an offense under the
 laws of this state, another state, or the United States is, except
 as provided by Subsection (g), a felony if, at the time it is
 committed, the offense:
 (1) is designated by a law of this state as a felony;
 (2)  contains all the elements of an offense designated
 by a law of this state as a felony; or
 (3)  is punishable by confinement for one year or more
 in a penitentiary.
 (g)  An offense is not considered a felony for purposes of
 Subsection (f) if, at the time the person possesses a firearm, the
 offense:
 (1)  is designated by a law of this state as a
 misdemeanor; or
 (2)  does not contain all the elements of any offense
 designated by a law of this state as a felony.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act in amending
 Sections 411.171 and 411.172, Government Code, apply only to the
 eligibility of a person for the issuance, modification, or renewal
 of a license, the application for which is made on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A holder of a license that was issued,
 modified, or renewed before the effective date of this Act is not
 disqualified from holding that license solely by reason of this
 Act.
 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Section 46.04, Penal Code, applies only to an offense committed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed
 before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law in
 effect when the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section,
 an offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if
 any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *