Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1432 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1432
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the investigation, prosecution, and punishment of
 criminal Medicaid fraud and certain other offenses related to
 Medicaid fraud; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (4), Section 242.002, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (4) "Department" means the [Texas] Department of Aging
 and Disability [Human] Services.
 SECTION 2. Subsections (a-1), (b), (d), (f), and (g),
 Section 22.04, Penal Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a-1) A person commits an offense if the person is an owner,
 operator, or employee of a group home, nursing facility, assisted
 living facility, intermediate care facility for persons with mental
 retardation, or other institutional care facility and the person
 intentionally, knowingly, recklessly, or with criminal negligence
 by omission causes to a child, elderly individual, or disabled
 individual who is a resident of that group home or facility:
 (1) serious bodily injury;
 (2) serious mental deficiency, impairment, or injury;
 or
 (3) bodily injury[; or
 [(4) exploitation].
 (b) An omission that causes a condition described by
 Subsection (a)(1), (2), or (3) or (a-1)(1), (2), or (3)[, or (4)] is
 conduct constituting an offense under this section if:
 (1) the actor has a legal or statutory duty to act; or
 (2) the actor has assumed care, custody, or control of
 a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual.
 (d) For purposes of an omission that causes a condition
 described by Subsection (a)(1), (2), or (3), the actor has assumed
 care, custody, or control if he has by act, words, or course of
 conduct acted so as to cause a reasonable person to conclude that he
 has accepted responsibility for protection, food, shelter, and
 medical care for a child, elderly individual, or disabled
 individual. For purposes of an omission that causes a condition
 described by Subsection (a-1)(1), (2), or (3), [or (4),] the actor
 acting during the actor's capacity as owner, operator, or employee
 of a group home or facility described by Subsection (a-1) is
 considered to have accepted responsibility for protection, food,
 shelter, and medical care for the child, elderly individual, or
 disabled individual who is a resident of the group home or facility.
 (f) An offense under Subsection (a)(3) or (a-1)(3) [or (4)]
 is a felony of the third degree when the conduct is committed
 intentionally or knowingly. When the conduct is engaged in
 recklessly, the offense is a state jail felony.
 (g) An offense under Subsection (a) is a state jail felony
 when the person acts with criminal negligence. An offense under
 Subsection (a-1) is a state jail felony when the person, with
 criminal negligence and by omission, causes a condition described
 by Subsection (a-1)(1), (2), or (3)[, or (4)].
 SECTION 3. Subsection (d), Section 32.46, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d) In this section:
 (1) "Deception" [, "deception"] has the meaning
 assigned by Section 31.01.
 (2)  "Document" includes electronically stored data or
 other information that is retrievable in a readable, perceivable
 form.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter D, Chapter 32, Penal Code, is amended
 by adding Section 32.53 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.53.  EXPLOITATION OF CHILD, ELDERLY INDIVIDUAL, OR
 DISABLED INDIVIDUAL. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Child," "elderly individual," and "disabled
 individual" have the meanings assigned by Section 22.04.
 (2)  "Exploitation" means the illegal or improper use
 of an individual or of the resources of the individual for monetary
 or personal benefit, profit, or gain.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person intentionally,
 knowingly, or recklessly causes the exploitation of a child,
 elderly individual, or disabled individual.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a felony of the third
 degree.
 (d)  A person who is subject to prosecution under both this
 section and another section of this code may be prosecuted under
 either or both sections. Section 3.04 does not apply to criminal
 episodes prosecuted under both this section and another section of
 this code. If a criminal episode is prosecuted under both this
 section and another section of this code and sentences are assessed
 for convictions under both sections, the sentences shall run
 concurrently.
 SECTION 5. Section 35A.01, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subdivision (10) to read as follows:
 (10)  "High managerial agent" means a director,
 officer, or employee who is authorized to act on behalf of a
 provider and has duties of such responsibility that the conduct of
 the director, officer, or employee reasonably may be assumed to
 represent the policy or intent of the provider.
 SECTION 6. Section 35A.02, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (c) If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another section of this code or
 another provision of law, the actor may be prosecuted under either
 this section or the other section or provision or both this section
 and the other section or provision.
 (e)  The punishment prescribed for an offense under this
 section is increased to the punishment prescribed for the next
 highest category of offense if it is shown beyond a reasonable doubt
 on the trial of the offense that the actor was a provider or high
 managerial agent at the time of the offense.
 SECTION 7. Subsection (a), Section 71.02, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person commits an offense if, with the intent to
 establish, maintain, or participate in a combination or in the
 profits of a combination or as a member of a criminal street gang,
 he commits or conspires to commit one or more of the following:
 (1) murder, capital murder, arson, aggravated
 robbery, robbery, burglary, theft, aggravated kidnapping,
 kidnapping, aggravated assault, aggravated sexual assault, sexual
 assault, forgery, deadly conduct, assault punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor, burglary of a motor vehicle, or unauthorized use of a
 motor vehicle;
 (2) any gambling offense punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor;
 (3) promotion of prostitution, aggravated promotion
 of prostitution, or compelling prostitution;
 (4) unlawful manufacture, transportation, repair, or
 sale of firearms or prohibited weapons;
 (5) unlawful manufacture, delivery, dispensation, or
 distribution of a controlled substance or dangerous drug, or
 unlawful possession of a controlled substance or dangerous drug
 through forgery, fraud, misrepresentation, or deception;
 (6) any unlawful wholesale promotion or possession of
 any obscene material or obscene device with the intent to wholesale
 promote the same;
 (7) any offense under Subchapter B, Chapter 43,
 depicting or involving conduct by or directed toward a child
 younger than 18 years of age;
 (8) any felony offense under Chapter 32;
 (9) any offense under Chapter 36;
 (10) any offense under Chapter 34, [or] 35, or 35A;
 (11) any offense under Section 37.11(a);
 (12) any offense under Chapter 20A; or
 (13) any offense under Section 37.10.
 SECTION 8. Subdivision (4), Subsection (c), Section 22.04,
 Penal Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 9. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *