Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1437 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1437
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of an associate judge in a Title IV-D case.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (e), Section 201.104, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e) Notwithstanding Subsection (d) and subject to Section
 201.1042(g), an associate judge may hear and render an order on:
 (1) a suit to modify or clarify an existing child
 support order;
 (2) a motion to enforce a child support order or revoke
 a respondent's community supervision and suspension of commitment;
 [or]
 (3) a respondent's compliance with the conditions
 provided in the associate judge's report for suspension of the
 respondent's commitment; or
 (4)  a motion for postjudgment relief, including a
 motion for a new trial or to vacate, correct, or reform a judgment,
 if neither party has requested a de novo hearing before the
 referring court.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a Title IV-D case referred to an associate judge under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 201, Family Code, on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A Title IV-D case referred to an associate judge before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the case was referred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *