Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1454 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1454
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 5, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1454 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right to an expunction of records and files relating
 to a person's arrest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Article 55.01, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person who has been placed under a custodial or
 noncustodial arrest for commission of either a felony or
 misdemeanor is entitled to have all records and files relating to
 the arrest expunged if:
 (1) the person is tried for the offense for which the
 person was arrested and is:
 (A) acquitted by the trial court, except as
 provided by Subsection (c) [of this section]; or
 (B) convicted and subsequently pardoned; or
 (2) the person has been released and the charge, if
 any, has not resulted in a final conviction and is no longer pending
 and there was no court-ordered community supervision under Article
 42.12 for any offense except for a Class C misdemeanor, provided
 that [each of the following conditions exist]:
 (A) an indictment or information charging the
 person with the commission of a felony or misdemeanor:
 (i) has not been presented within the
 previous 180 days against the person for an offense arising out of
 the transaction for which the person was arrested; or
 (ii) [, if an indictment or information
 charging the person with commission of a felony was presented, the
 indictment or information] has been dismissed or quashed for more
 than 180 days, and[:
 [(i)     the limitations period expired before
 the date on which a petition for expunction was filed under Article
 55.02; or
 [(ii)] the court finds that the indictment
 or information was dismissed or quashed because the presentment had
 been made because of mistake, false information, or other similar
 reason indicating absence of probable cause at the time of the
 dismissal to believe the person committed the offense or because it
 was void; or
 (B) prosecution of the person for the offense for
 which the person was arrested is no longer possible because the
 limitations period has expired [the person has been released and
 the charge, if any, has not resulted in a final conviction and is no
 longer pending and there was no court ordered community supervision
 under Article 42.12 for any offense other than a Class C
 misdemeanor; and
 [(C)     the person has not been convicted of a
 felony in the five years preceding the date of the arrest].
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a-1), Article 55.01, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 person seeking expunction of records relating to an arrest
 regardless of whether the arrest occurred before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *