Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1472 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallegos S.B. No. 1472
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 2, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1472 By: Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public meetings for permit applications under the Texas
 Clean Air Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 382.056, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (k-1) to read as follows:
 (k-1)  A permit applicant or the applicant's designated
 representative is required to attend a public meeting held under
 this section and must make a reasonable effort to respond to
 questions relevant to the permit application at the meeting.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (k-1), Section 382.056, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies to a public meeting under
 Section 382.056, Health and Safety Code, held on or after September
 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *