By: Carona S.B. No. 1479 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 20, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1479 By: Ellis A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to benefits payable under certain health coverages. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subtitle E, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Chapter 1425 to read as follows: CHAPTER 1425. APPLICATION OF SUBTITLE TO CERTAIN COVERAGE Sec. 1425.001. EXEMPTION FROM APPLICATION OF SUBTITLE. (a) Except as provided by Section 1425.002, a provision of this subtitle that becomes effective on or after January 2, 2010, does not apply to: (1) a plan that provides coverage only: (A) for a specified disease or diseases or under an individual limited benefit policy; (B) for accidental death or dismemberment; (C) as a supplement to a liability insurance policy; or (D) for dental or vision care; (2) disability income insurance coverage or a combination of accident-only and disability income insurance coverage; (3) credit insurance coverage; (4) a hospital confinement indemnity policy; (5) a Medicare supplemental policy as defined by Section 1882(g)(1), Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395ss); (6) a workers' compensation insurance policy; (7) medical payment insurance coverage provided under a motor vehicle insurance policy; (8) a long-term care insurance policy, including a nursing home fixed indemnity policy, except as provided by Subsection (b); or (9) an occupational accident policy. (b) A long-term care insurance policy, including a nursing home fixed indemnity policy, is subject to this subtitle if the commissioner determines that the policy provides benefits so comprehensive that it is a health benefit plan and should not be subject to the exemption provided under this section. Sec. 1425.002. SPECIFIC LANGUAGE CONTROLS. A provision of this subtitle that becomes effective on or after January 2, 2010, and that requires coverage or the offer of coverage of a health care service or benefit applies to a plan or policy described by Section 1425.001(a) only to the extent expressly and specifically provided by law. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *