Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1506 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1506
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 20, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1506 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of the costs associated with certain
 conditions of bond.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 17.44, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (c) The magistrate may revoke the bond and order the
 defendant arrested if the [If a] defendant:
 (1) violates a condition of home confinement and
 electronic monitoring;
 (2) [,] refuses to submit to a test for controlled
 substances[,] or submits to a test for controlled substances and
 the test indicates the presence of a controlled substance in the
 defendant's body; or
 (3)  fails to pay the costs of monitoring or testing for
 controlled substances, if payment is ordered under Subsection (e)
 as a condition of bond and the magistrate determines that the
 defendant is not indigent and is financially able to make the
 payments as ordered[, the magistrate may revoke the bond and order
 the defendant arrested].
 (e)  The cost of electronic monitoring or testing for
 controlled substances under this article may be assessed as court
 costs or ordered paid directly by the defendant as a condition of
 bond.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *